HI HB7 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes the personal use, possession, and sale of marijuana in a specified quantity. Requires licensing to operate marijuana establishments. Subjects marijuana establishments to excise taxes and income taxes. Amends certain provisions of the criminal code relating to marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseRe-referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback