HI HB694 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB694
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes general obligation bonds for the design and construction of a new athletic facility for the University of Hawaii at Manoa. Requires a one-third private sector funding match. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB694 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=694&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB694_.HTM |