HI HB678 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB678
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the newborn hearing screening statute to mandate reporting of diagnostic audiologic evaluation results to improve hearing follow-up of infants. Updates definitions and terminology. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 769) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1970) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1066), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB678 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).