HI HB677 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal year 2014-2015 as a subsidy for Hawaii health systems corporation for employment costs.
Title
Hawaii Heath Systems; Collective Bargaining Cost Items; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB206 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=677&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB677_.HTM |