HI HB673 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB673
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on HSG/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on HSG/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to reclassify lands fifteen to one hundred acres in certain rural, urban, and agricultural districts in which at least fifty per cent of the housing units on the land sought to be reclassified are set aside for persons and families with incomes at or below one hundred forty per cent of the area median income.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Rachele Fernandez Lamosao [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HSG/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, referral sheet 5 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB673 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - The committee(s) on HSG/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB469 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB469 (Same As) 2023-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=673&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB673_.HTM |