HI HB672 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB672
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary Kalihi 21st Century Commission in the Office of Planning. Requires the Commission to develop a community development plan for the Kalihi area on Oahu.
Title
Relating To The Kalihi Twenty-first Century Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB672 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRN/HSG/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=672&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB672_.HTM |