HI HB667 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB667

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the department of health to issue medical cannabis delivery permits and medical cannabis transporter licenses for the delivery of medical cannabis and manufactured cannabis products to qualifying patients if certain conditions are met. Increases the allowable number of retail dispensing locations and cannabis plants per dispensary license. Allows a licensed dispensary to purchase medical cannabis or manufactured cannabis products from another licensed dispensary, with department approval, in the event of a crop failure or an inability to meet product demand or to provide more product diversity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB667 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback