HI HB665 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants OHA officers and employees collective bargaining rights. Gives OHA voting rights as a public employer. (HB665 HD1)
Title
OHA; Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB782 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.