HI HB660 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB660
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the microtargeting of political advertisements on television and social media based on online behavioral data, demographic characteristics, and geographic location below the electoral district level.
Title
Relating To Political Advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | House | Re-referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 10 |
2021-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB660 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Re-referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 10
HB660 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Re-referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=660&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB660_.HTM |