HI HB660 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB660
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the infrastructure development loan subaccount within the dwelling unit revolving fund to make loans to developers to finance the costs of the infrastructure of housing developments. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD1)
Title
Relating To An Infrastructure Development Loan Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Galuteria. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HOU/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 284). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decison-making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB660 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Infrastructure Development
Loans
Revolving Fund
Subaccount
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Infrastructure Development
Loans
Revolving Fund
Subaccount