HI HB648 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it an unfair and deceptive practice to charge mileage or travel fees to customers for the delivery of goods and services except as otherwise specified.
Title
Relating To Unfair And Deceptive Practices.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB648 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=648&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB648_.HTM |