HI HB648 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the removal or replacement of a director elected by a class of unit owners shall be by a majority of only the members of that class. Specifies that for an election in a mixed-use condominium project where directors are elected by different classes of owners, an association may cast a vote or votes allocated to any nonresidential unit owned by the association where those eligible to vote in the election are limited to owners of one or more nonresidential units, including the nonresidential unit owned by the association.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 538), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 15 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB648 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=648&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB648_.HTM |