HI HB630 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes limited access by designated state or county agencies limited to private real property for the purpose of painting over graffiti if owner or occupant of the property has not painted over the graffiti within 30 days after notice to do so. Requires the attorney general to create an internet-based library of graffiti tags to assist in identifying graffiti taggers.
Title
Graffiti; Eradication
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, FIN , referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=630&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB630_.HTM |