HI HB624 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the factors under which the family awards custody and visitation of a minor child to ensure parental parity.
Title
Family Court; Custody; Parental Parity
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=624&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB624_.HTM |