HI HB624 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies state-operated schools, libraries, community colleges, and universities as examples of facilities that are places of public accommodation subject to anti-discriminatory prohibitions.
Title
Public Accommodations; Discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Jon Karamatsu [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-09 2:30 PM in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 2/9/2009. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED-EDN on Thursday, 02-05-09 2:00 PM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HED/EDN, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=624&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB624_.HTM |