HI HB623 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Re-referred to ECD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Re-referred to ECD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts foods and medical services products from the general excise tax.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Pierick [R] | Rep. David Alcos [R] | Rep. Diamond Garcia [R] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Re-referred to ECD/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=623&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB623_.HTM |