HI HB623 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB623
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and funds a Broadband Coordinator position within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, to develop the State of Hawaii Broadband Plan. Requires a report.
Title
Relating To Broadband.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to IAC/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB623 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to IAC/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=623&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB623_.HTM |