HI HB623 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a petty misdemeanor to operate a motor vehicle while using a text messaging device. Provides an exemption for using voice operated or hands-free technology. (HB623 HD1)
Title
Traffic Violations; Driver Distractions
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-07-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |