HI HB621 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the instream use of water for commercial kalo cultivation conducted in a manner consistent with traditional and customary practices of Native Hawaiians from the existing process for the disposition of water rights.
Title
Relating To The Disposition Of Water Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB621 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
SB735 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 9:45AM in conference room 229.
SB735 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 9:45AM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=621&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB621_.HTM |