HI HB621 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Gradually prohibits the manufacture and sale of personal care products containing synthetic plastic microbeads to protect marine life. Effective 7/1/2053. (SD1)
Title
Health; Environmental Protection; Synthetic Plastic Microbeads; Marine Life
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs; Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, McKelvey, Ing, Lowen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kidani, Slom. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/CPN deferred the measure until 03-24-15 3:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17). |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen. |
2015-02-17 | House | Re-referred to EEP, OMH, referral sheet 19 |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 219) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, OMH, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |