HI HB621 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the voter registration requirement to include only the last four digits of the person's social security number on application to register affidavit.
Title
Voter Registration; Social Security Number
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 01-31-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-24-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=621 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB621_.HTM |