HI HB620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to change the Board of Education back to an elected board. (HB620 HD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Hawaii Constitution To Require The Election Of Members Of The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ohno, Tarnas; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 01-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB620 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).