HI HB604 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture, in consultation with the department of health, to create and maintain a list of plants and landscaping-related structures or equipment that are known to be preferred habitats for mosquito breeding and prohibits use of these elements in public landscaping. Exempts routinely maintained botanical gardens. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Landscaping.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 126). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-08 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB604 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.