HI HB604 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires county gray water recycling programs to conform to standards established by the department of health.
Title
Health; Gray Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Herkes. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=604&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB604_.HTM |