HI HB601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB601
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to establish driving while impaired courts in Kona and Hilo on Hawaii island.
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 131), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB601 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=601&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB601_.HTM |