HI HB60 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows motor vehicle audible reverse warning system to be manually turned off between the hours of 10:00 p.m. and 6:00 a.m.; provided that the vehicle is guided while reversing by a person other than the driver of the vehicle. Assigns liability to the person guiding the vehicle. (HB60 HD1)
Title
Audible Reverse Warning Systems
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Pine. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-09 8:30am in House conference room 306. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB600 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.