HI HB588 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB588
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Sustainability Coordinator of the Office of Planning to complete a holistic and comprehensive study and plan for green infrastructure opportunities in the State. Appropriates funds to complete the green infrastructure study and plan. Effective 7/1/2150. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Green Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 11:30AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, S. Chang, Riviere Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Yamane, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Todd, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 760) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from HOU/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1945) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to HOU/WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to HOU/WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, HOU/WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 201). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB588 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 224.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Green Infrastructure Study and Plan
Office of Planning
State Sustainability Coordinator
Green Infrastructure Study and Plan
Office of Planning
State Sustainability Coordinator