HI HB588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB588
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal year 2018-2019 to maintain the initial staff positions that are necessary to develop and manage the Heeia National Estuarine Research Reserve and its programs. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Making An Appropriation For Heeia National Estuarine Research Reserve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz, Kidani. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, McKelvey, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to WAL, HED, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1474) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE/WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 117). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB588 (Carry Over) 2017-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).