HI HB587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB587
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to provide additional resources to the Small Business Regulatory Review Board. Effective 7/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Small Business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Taniguchi Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 116). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB587 (Carry Over) 2017-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.