HI HB587 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each county's liquor commission to appoint and remove their respective liquor administrator, unless otherwise prescribed by their respective county charter. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB587 HD2)
Title
Liquor Commission; Liquor Administrator; Counties
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 132). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Saiki, Souki. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-01-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |