HI HB586 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices on premises of the facilities operated by the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation (HHSC). Requires HHSC to consult with the exclusive representatives of the public sector collective bargaining units. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Tobacco Products; Electronic Smoking Devices; Prohibition; HHSC Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 229. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 8:45AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Baker, Gabbard, Galuteria. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 208). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Keohokalole, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa, Oshiro; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-04-15 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-30-15 10:10AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |