HI HB582 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The recommendation was not adopted. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The recommendation was not adopted. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a preference under the procurement code for employers who pledge to hire individuals with disabilities when contracting for goods, services, or construction through competitive sealed bidding, competitive sealed proposals, or both.
Title
Relating To Preferences Under The Procurement Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The recommendation was not adopted. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR/ECD on Friday, 02-05-21 11:35AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR/ECD on Friday, 02-05-21 11:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR/ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The recommendation was not adopted. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 4 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; and 0 Excused: none.