HI HB58 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 5:30 PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 5:30 PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the protective order card pilot program within the Honolulu family justice center to issue protective order cards upon request of individuals holding a long-term protective order issued by a court of the first circuit of the State, with specified relevant information about the protective orders and all covered parties. Appropriates funds for a grant-in-aid to the Honolulu family justice center. Effective 7/1/2050. Sunsets on 12/31/2018. (SD2)
Title
Protective Order Card Pilot Program; Protective Orders; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 5:30 PM in Conference Room 325. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1453) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-30-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB471 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Re-Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM.