HI HB58 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the board of directors of an association to allow owners to install antennas for amateur radios. Requires a written statement of the reasons for a denial.
Title
Condominium Property Regimes; HAM Radio Equipment
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-09-09 2:15 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB595 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=58&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB58_.HTM |