HI HB569 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB569
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the victim-counselor privilege under Rule 505.5 of the Hawaii Rules of Evidence to include victims of dating violence, stalking, and sexual harassment and confidential advocates employed by the University of Hawaii. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Victim-counselor Privilege.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB832 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
HB569 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB569 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).