HI HB565 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the DLNR and other agencies with administrative control over state lands to enter into lease agreements with businesses that engage in projects under the New Markets Tax Credit Program. Effective 7/1/11. Sunset 12/31/12.
Title
State Lands; Lease Agreements; New Markets Tax Credit Program
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-08-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=565 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB565_.HTM |