HI HB561 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB561
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that income tax credits established or renewed after 12/31/2023 include a five-year sunset or an annual one-third reduction beginning with the sixth year of the credit. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Tax Credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1171), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cochran; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos. |
2023-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 165) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-01 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1117 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB561 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to WAM.
HB561 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=561&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB561_HD1_.HTM |