HI HB555 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB555
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows candidates seeking election to use campaign funds for child care and vital household dependent care costs under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB555 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB627 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:45PM; Conference Room 325.
SB627 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:45PM; Conference Room 325.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=555&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB555_.HTM |