HI HB555 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB555
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions regarding examinations of defendants' fitness to proceed in the prosecution.
Title
Relating To Examinations Of Fitness To Proceed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB555 (Carry Over) 2017-02-24 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB145 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/PBS, JUD, referral sheet 27
SB145 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/PBS, JUD, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=555&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB555_.HTM |