HI HB555 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state smart growth public infrastructure policy. Requires state agencies involved in the planning, development, and financing of public infrastructure to consider smart growth criteria prior to approving or financing any public infrastructure projects. Requires the chief executive officers of each state agency involved in the planning, development, and financing of public infrastructure projects to attest that a project meets the smart growth criteria or prepare a statement of justification. Requires each state agency involved in the planning, development, and financing of public infrastructure to create a smart growth advisory committee. Precludes any private right of action. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB555 HD1)
Title
Public Infrastructure; Smart Growth
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Richard Lee Fale [R] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |