HI HB550 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires and establishes deadlines for state facilities, except smaller facilities and facilities at Aloha Stadium, to implement cost-effective energy efficiency measures. Directs the Hawaii state energy office to collect utility bill and energy usage data for state-owned buildings and to make the data publicly available. Establishes a goal for the State to achieve at least a twenty-five percent reduction in the electricity consumption of state facilities. Provides that certain agencies that perform energy efficiency retrofitting may continue to receive appropriations for energy expenditures. Beginning 7/1/2022, requires, where feasible and cost-effective, the design of all new state building construction to maximize energy and water efficiency, maximize energy generation potential, and use building materials that reduce the carbon footprint of the project. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Energy Efficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-02HouseRe-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB501 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to GVO/EET, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback