HI HB549 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the automatic deposit of general excise tax revenues into the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund until such time that the trust fund's unfunded actuarial accrued liability is fully amortized. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Unfunded Actuarial Accrued Liability
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=549&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB549_.HTM |