HI HB548 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB548

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires county boards of water supply to provide an accounting of water credits to and to reserve credits for the department of Hawaiian home lands. Requires boards to develop policies that reduce nonpublic trust uses before other uses in cases of emergency. Requires boards to apply for leases for water from state lands. Designates a certain number of board members to represent interests for water allocation on Hawaiian home lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The County Boards Of Water Supply.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB548 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback