HI HB540 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, no later than 1/1/2015, the board of trustees of the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund to require every health benefits plan established or contracted to include lower deductibles and co-payments for non-tobacco smokers and other persons of low risk. Requires the board to consult with medical professionals to determine low risk behavior. Prohibits genetic factors and pre-existing conditions as being considered a behavior. Effective 7/1/2013.
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Deductibles, Co-Payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=540&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB540_.HTM |