HI HB538 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 219, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 219, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires wireless telecommunications service providers to release domestic violence victims from shared service plans upon request and with documentation. Authorizes the family court to order wireless providers to transfer billing authority for or release domestic violence victims from shared service plans upon petition by a victim. (HB538 CD1)
Title
Domestic Violence; Wireless Telecommunications Service Providers
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act 219, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). |
2015-07-10 | House | Act 219, on 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, McKelvey, Rhoads, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-08-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 15). |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Woodson, McDermott. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-26-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 451) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2015-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3). |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB752 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.