HI HB53 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Act 007, Special Session 2021, 07/08/21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Act 007, Special Session 2021, 07/08/21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds. Makes findings required by Article VII, Section 13, of the Hawaii State Constitution to declare that the issuance of authorized bonds will not cause the debt limit to be exceeded. (CD1)
Title
Relating To State Bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Act 007, Special Session 2021, 07/08/21. |
2021-07-08 | House | Act 007, 2021 Special Session, on 07-08-21, veto overrride. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Received notice from House that motion to override veto was approved and carried by a 2/3 vote by the members of the House (Hse. Com. No. 6). |
2021-07-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 10) motion to override veto that was approved and carried by a 2/3 vote by the members of the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | House | Veto overridden by 2/3's vote with 45 Ayes; 0 Noes none; and 6 Excused Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan, McKelvey, Nakashima, Takumi, Todd. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Veto overridden - 2/3's vote: Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Deferred until 07-08-21. |
2021-07-06 | House | Deferred one day 07-08-21. |
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/06/2021 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 181). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 181) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-21 2:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kanuha, Wakai, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 620) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-29-21 3:00PM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-21 9:40AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-25-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-25-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 107). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |