HI HB521 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB521

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the high-growth grant program and special fund to provide grants to qualified businesses for certain business development activities. Makes appropriations. Effective 7/1/2038. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Business Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
2018-03-14HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2018-01-17HouseReceived notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
2018-01-17SenateSenate Conferee(s) discharged.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.
2017-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.
2017-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; English Co-Chair; Taniguchi.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ward.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 579) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07SenateOne Day Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1565) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2017-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to ETT, WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 105).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, Tupola.
2017-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-02-14HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-08HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-25HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB767 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB521 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 423.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback