HI HB520 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB520
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an exemption from the general excise tax established by section 201H-36, Hawaii Revised Statutes, that has been approved by the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation shall be provided once the qualified person or firm has filed or recorded the regulatory agreement in land court or the bureau of conveyances, whichever is appropriate.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB520 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=520&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB520_.HTM |