HI HB505 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Office of Planning to contract with a consultant to develop a plan for a statewide greenways plan. Appropriates funds. Effective January 1, 2857. (HB505 HD2)
Title
Greenways; Appropriation for Consultant ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-07-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |