HI HB505 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for flood mitigation on various recurring flooded areas of the State due to heavy rains. Effective 7/1/2117. (SD2)
Title
Flood Mitigation; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill re-scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 1:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Har Co-Chairs; Awana, Jordan, Nakashima, Riviere. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Reported from TIA/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 1:16PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 114). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chong, Thielen. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |